Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 415 Today
» 937 Yesterday
» 1352 Week
» 8536 Month
» 316517 Year
» 1200898 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1135 m/e 03/1907
LNER (1924) 6135   31/01/1925
LNER (1946) 3226   06/10/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/103/1907
Q4/204/02/1933
Q4/107/08/1943
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4478
To Service During 03/1907 to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Withdrawal Mon 16/10/1950 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 43 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 21/10/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction (New) m/e 03/1907
ARD Ardsley 07/05/1931
   Withdrawn 16/10/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN 37A Ardsley 16/10/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1265)
24/02/1912 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 848)
09/06/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1272)
18/10/1919 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1407)
31/01/1925 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1817)
04/06/1927 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 352)
25/04/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 312)
04/02/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 145)
15/02/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1772)
11/02/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3725)
11/02/1939 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
05/04/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 495)
07/08/1943 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 893)
06/10/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 876)
10/01/1948 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 3770)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1912 24/02/1912   General
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1917 09/06/1917   General
Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1919 18/10/1919   General
Boiler number 1407 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1921 17/09/1921 92 days General  
Gorton Works 10/03/1923 05/05/1923 57 days General  
Gorton Works 20/12/1924 31/01/1925 43 days General
Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6135
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1927 04/06/1927 134 days General
Boiler number 352 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1929 16/03/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 11/04/1931 25/04/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 312 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1933 04/02/1933 22 days General
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 145 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1936 15/02/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1772 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1939 11/02/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 15/04/1939 1 day Light Repair
Slide valves refaced
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1941 05/04/1941 22 days General
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1943 07/08/1943 18 days General
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1945 06/10/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1947 1 day Light Repair
Firehole ring fractured
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1947 10/01/1948 97 days General
Boiler number 3770 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1907 To Service To service as GCR Number 1135
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4478
Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 24/02/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 09/06/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 18/10/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1407 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
18/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1921. Dep: 17/09/1921.    
10/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1923. Dep: 05/05/1923.    
20/12/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1924. Dep: 31/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6135
   
22/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 352 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
16/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 16/03/1929.    
11/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1931. Dep: 25/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 312 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
07/05/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
14/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1933. Dep: 04/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 145 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
01/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1936. Dep: 15/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1772 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1939. Dep: 11/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
15/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Slide valves refaced
   
15/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1941. Dep: 05/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
21/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
15/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3226    
25/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Firehole ring fractured
   
06/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1947. Dep: 10/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3770 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
16/10/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 3226 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev