Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1136 m/e 03/1907
LNER (1924) 6136   25/04/1925
LNER (1946) 3227   03/11/1946
BR 63227 w/e 13/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/103/1907
Q4/225/04/1925
Q4/124/07/1943
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4479
To Service During 03/1907
Withdrawal Sat 26/05/1951 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 44 yrs, 2 mths , 27 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction 01/09/1922
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 03/08/1943
NWE New England 12/12/1943
NWE New England (M&GNR) 27/08/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 28/10/1945
BRN Barnsley 14/04/1946
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947
37A Ardsley m/e 08/1950
   Withdrawn 26/05/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947
ALLOC 37A Ardsley w/e 20/08/1950
WDN   26/05/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1266)
18/06/1910 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 864)
01/05/1915 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1407)
22/03/1919 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1113)
25/04/1925 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 601)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
26/10/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 553)
16/01/1932 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 842)
30/06/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 850)
27/06/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 553)
03/09/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 876)
08/03/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 722)
24/07/1943 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 914)
13/11/1948 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 3767)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1910 18/06/1910   General
Boiler number 864 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1915 01/05/1915   General
Boiler number 1407 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1919 22/03/1919   General
Boiler number 1113 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1921 30/04/1921 43 days General  
Gorton Works 26/05/1923 17/11/1923 176 days General  
Gorton Works 07/03/1925 25/04/1925 50 days General
Boiler number 601 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6136
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1927 14/05/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 28/09/1929 26/10/1929 29 days General
Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1931 16/01/1932 17 days General
Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1934 30/06/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1936 27/06/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1938 03/09/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1941 08/03/1941 57 days General
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1943 24/07/1943 18 days General
Boiler number 914 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1946 06/04/1946 29 days General  
Gorton Works 23/10/1948 13/11/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3767 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to BR 63227
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1907 To Service To service as GCR Number 1136
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4479
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 18/06/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 864 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 01/05/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1407 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 22/03/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1113 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1921. Dep: 30/04/1921.    
01/09/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
26/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1923. Dep: 17/11/1923.    
07/03/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1925. Dep: 25/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 601 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6136
   
26/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 14/05/1927.    
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
28/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1929. Dep: 26/10/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
31/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1931. Dep: 16/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 30/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 27/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
20/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 03/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 876 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1941. Dep: 08/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 914 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
27/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE) (M&GNR)    
28/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
09/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946.    
14/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3227    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
23/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1948. Dep: 13/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3767 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to BR 63227
   
08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
26/05/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63227 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev