Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 273 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2180 Week
» 20962 Month
» 269255 Year
» 1153636 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1137 m/e 03/1907
LNER (1924) 6137   17/05/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/103/1907
Q4/214/07/1928
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4480
To Service During 03/1907 to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Withdrawal Tue 28/02/1939 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 31 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction (New) m/e 03/1907
CLK Colwick 23/02/1934
ARD Ardsley 02/11/1935
   Withdrawn 28/02/1939

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1267)
26/08/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1271)
26/04/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 846)
04/08/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1110)
27/01/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1267)
17/06/1926 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1266)
14/07/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1901)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
23/08/1930 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 723)
01/10/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 525)
26/01/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 898)
09/10/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 918)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1911 26/08/1911   General
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1913 26/04/1913   General
Boiler number 846 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 04/08/1917   General
Boiler number 1110 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1922 27/01/1923 148 days General
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1924 17/05/1924 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6137
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1926 17/06/1926 48 days General
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1928 14/07/1928 29 days General
Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1930 23/08/1930 36 days General
Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1932 01/10/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 525 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1935 26/01/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 898 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1937 09/10/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1907 To Service To service as GCR Number 1137
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4480
Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 26/08/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 26/04/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 846 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 04/08/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1110 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
02/09/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1922. Dep: 27/01/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
29/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6137
   
01/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1926. Dep: 17/06/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
16/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1928. Dep: 14/07/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
19/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1930. Dep: 23/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
17/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1932. Dep: 01/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 525 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1935. Dep: 26/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 898 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
02/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
25/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1937. Dep: 09/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/02/1939 Withdrawn Condemned as 6137 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev