Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 942 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 6286 Week
» 7176 Month
» 315157 Year
» 1199538 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1138 m/e 03/1907
LNER (1924) 6138   10/05/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/103/1907
Q4/212/05/1928
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4481
To Service During 03/1907 to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Withdrawal Wed 05/12/1934 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 27 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 8/12/34

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction (New) m/e 03/1907
CLK Colwick 20/02/1934
   Withdrawn 05/12/1934

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1268)
13/07/1912 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 849)
08/04/1916 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1406)
21/02/1920 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1841)
10/05/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 522)
12/05/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 849)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
05/11/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 646)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1912 13/07/1912   General
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1916 08/04/1916   General
Boiler number 1406 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/12/1919 21/02/1920 57 days General
Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1922 20/05/1922 78 days General  
Gorton Works 15/12/1923 10/05/1924 148 days General
Boiler number 522 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6138
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1925 09/01/1926 50 days General  
Gorton Works 18/02/1928 12/05/1928 85 days General
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1930 24/05/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 22/10/1932 05/11/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 646 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1907 To Service To service as GCR Number 1138
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4481
Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 13/07/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: 08/04/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1406 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
27/12/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1919. Dep: 21/02/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
04/03/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1922. Dep: 20/05/1922.    
15/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1923. Dep: 10/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 522 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6138
   
21/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1925. Dep: 09/01/1926.    
18/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1928. Dep: 12/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
26/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1930. Dep: 24/05/1930.    
22/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1932. Dep: 05/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 646 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
20/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
05/12/1934 Withdrawn Condemned as 6138 from Colwick (CLK)    

prev prev