Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 164 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2071 Week
» 20853 Month
» 269146 Year
» 1153527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1140 m/e 03/1907
LNER (1924) 6140   19/04/1924
LNER (1946) 3228   30/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/103/1907
Q4/202/05/1931
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4483
To Service During 03/1907
Withdrawal Mon 15/08/1949 off Grantham (GRA)
Service Life 42 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction 20/06/1912
CLK Colwick 26/01/1927
KEA Keadby 11/09/1929
IMM Immingham 25/03/1931
CLK Colwick 04/10/1941
LNG Langwith Junction 05/10/1941
IMM Immingham 16/10/1941
LIN Lincoln 07/05/1942
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 12/12/1943
NWE New England 27/05/1945
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 28/10/1945
GRA Grantham 28/09/1946
   Withdrawn 15/08/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GRA Grantham 15/08/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1270)
17/01/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1367)
25/08/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1114)
02/12/1922 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1701)
15/01/1927 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 374)
13/07/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 201)
02/05/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 651)
02/05/1931 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
29/04/1933 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1691)
23/05/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 849)
08/10/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 915)
05/09/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3737)
21/10/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 642)
02/08/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 145)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1914 17/01/1914   General
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 25/08/1917   General
Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1922 02/12/1922 113 days General
Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1924 19/04/1924 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6140
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1926 15/01/1927 92 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1929 13/07/1929 29 days General
Boiler number 201 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 11/04/1931 02/05/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 651 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1933 29/04/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1936 23/05/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1938 08/10/1938 36 days General
Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1940 28/12/1940 15 days General  
Gorton Works 19/08/1942 05/09/1942 18 days General
After collision
Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1944 21/10/1944 19 days General
Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1947 02/08/1947 43 days General
Boiler number 145 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1907 To Service To service as GCR Number 1140
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4483
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
20/06/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 17/01/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 25/08/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
12/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1922. Dep: 02/12/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 19/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6140
   
16/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1926. Dep: 15/01/1927.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
26/01/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
15/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 13/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 201 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
11/09/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
25/03/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
11/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 651 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
01/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1933. Dep: 29/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1936. Dep: 23/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1938. Dep: 08/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
14/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940.    
04/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
05/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
16/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
07/05/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
19/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
After collision
Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
03/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
27/05/1945 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
28/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
28/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
30/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3228    
21/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1947. Dep: 02/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 145 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/08/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 3228 from Grantham (GRA)    

prev prev