|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1914 | 17/01/1914 | General | Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1917 | 25/08/1917 | General | Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1922 | 02/12/1922 | 113 days | General | Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1924 | 19/04/1924 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6140 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1926 | 15/01/1927 | 92 days | General | New cylinders Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1929 | 13/07/1929 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 201 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1931 | 02/05/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 651 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1933 | 29/04/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1936 | 23/05/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1938 | 08/10/1938 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1940 | 28/12/1940 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1942 | 05/09/1942 | 18 days | General | After collision Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1944 | 21/10/1944 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1947 | 02/08/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 145 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1907 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1140 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4483 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
20/06/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 17/01/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 25/08/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
12/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1922. Dep: 02/12/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
23/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 19/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6140 |
||
16/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1926. Dep: 15/01/1927. Work undertaken: New cylinders Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
26/01/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
15/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 13/07/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 201 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
11/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
25/03/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
11/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 651 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
01/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1933. Dep: 29/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
09/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1936. Dep: 23/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
03/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1938. Dep: 08/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
14/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940. | ||
04/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
05/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
16/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
07/05/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
19/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942. Work undertaken: After collision Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
03/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
27/05/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
28/10/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
28/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
30/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3228 | ||
21/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1947. Dep: 02/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 145 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
15/08/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3228 from Grantham (GRA) |