Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 573 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3716 Week
» 13886 Month
» 291682 Year
» 1176063 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1141 m/e 03/1907
LNER (1924) 6141   22/03/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/103/1907
Q4/228/04/1928
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4484
To Service During 03/1907 to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Withdrawal Tue 31/01/1939 off Langwith Junction (LNG)
Service Life 31 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction (New) m/e 03/1907
   Withdrawn 31/01/1939

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1271)
11/03/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 859)
22/03/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 431)
28/04/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 847)
05/03/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1701)
05/03/1932 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
18/08/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1903)
14/11/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 848)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1911 11/03/1911   General
Boiler number 859 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 03/02/1917   General
Returned to UK 5/6/19
 
Gorton Works 12/07/1919 09/08/1919 29 days General  
Gorton Works 30/07/1921 01/10/1921 64 days General  
Gorton Works 25/08/1924 22/03/1924 -155 days General  
Gorton Works 21/11/1925 13/02/1926 85 days General  
Gorton Works 18/02/1928 28/04/1928 71 days General
Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1930 17/05/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 20/02/1932 05/03/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1934 18/08/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 31/10/1936 14/11/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Doncaster Works 23/11/1938 25/11/1938 3 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1907 To Service To service as GCR Number 1141
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4484
Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 11/03/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 859 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 03/02/1917.
Work undertaken:
Returned to UK 5/6/19
   
12/07/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1919. Dep: 09/08/1919.    
30/07/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1921. Dep: 01/10/1921.    
22/03/1924 Modification Diagram 17Sat number 431 boiler fitted    
22/03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6141    
25/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924.    
21/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1925. Dep: 13/02/1926.    
18/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1928. Dep: 28/04/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
05/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930.    
20/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1932. Dep: 05/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
04/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
31/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1936. Dep: 14/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1938. Dep: 25/11/1938.    
31/01/1939 Withdrawn Condemned as 6141 from Langwith Junction (LNG)    

prev prev