Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1144 m/e 04/1907
LNER (1924) 6144   03/05/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/104/1907
Q4/210/07/1915
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Kitson
Works Number 4487
To Service During 04/1907 to Keadby (KEA)
Withdrawal Fri 07/01/1938 off Immingham (IMM)
Service Life 30 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KEA Keadby (New) m/e 04/1907
IMM Immingham 02/08/1930
   Withdrawn 07/01/1938

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1274)
10/07/1915 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1370)
25/09/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1263)
26/02/1927 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1911)
07/1930 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
02/08/1930 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1678)
07/01/1933 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 835)
31/12/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 728)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1915 10/07/1915   General
Boiler number 1370 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1920 25/09/1920   General
Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1922 13/01/1923 64 days General  
Gorton Works 08/03/1924 03/05/1924 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6144
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1926 26/02/1927 134 days General
Boiler number 1911 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1928 01/12/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 05/07/1930 02/08/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1678 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1932 07/01/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1935 31/12/1935 18 days General
Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1907 To Service To service as GCR Number 1144
Built at Kitson, Works Number 4487
Allocated to Keadby (KEA)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 10/07/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1370 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 25/09/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
11/11/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1922. Dep: 13/01/1923.    
08/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 03/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6144
   
16/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1926. Dep: 26/02/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1911 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
20/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1928. Dep: 01/12/1928.    
07/1930 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
05/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1930. Dep: 02/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1678 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
02/08/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
24/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1932. Dep: 07/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
14/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1935. Dep: 31/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/01/1938 Withdrawn Condemned as 6144 from Immingham (IMM)    

prev prev