Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 43 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1968 Week
» 19304 Month
» 297100 Year
» 1181481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 39 m/e 02/1909
LNER (1924) 5039   23/08/1924
LNER (1946) 3229   14/07/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/102/1909
Q4/206/08/1927
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 02/1909 to Keadby (KEA)
Withdrawal Mon 04/12/1950 off Barnsley (36D)
Service Life 41 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KEA Keadby (New) m/e 02/1909
FRO Frodingham 18/06/1932
BRN Barnsley 07/01/1939
MEX Mexborough 07/12/1939
GRA Grantham 23/02/1947
BRN Barnsley 06/03/1949
   Withdrawn 04/12/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GRA Grantham 23/02/1947
ALLOC BRN Barnsley w/e 12/03/1949
WDN   04/12/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1364)
31/01/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1263)
31/07/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1902)
06/08/1927 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 834)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
11/06/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 905)
12/01/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 333)
17/07/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 829)
17/07/1937 Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
28/09/1940 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
28/09/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 906)
04/09/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 495)
28/06/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3737)
27/12/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3736)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1914 31/01/1914   General
Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1920 31/07/1920   General
Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1922 16/09/1922 64 days General  
Gorton Works 03/05/1924 23/08/1924 113 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5039
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1927 06/08/1927 50 days General
Boiler number 834 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1929 21/09/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 04/06/1932 11/06/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1934 12/01/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1937 17/07/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 829 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1940 28/09/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1943 04/09/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1947 28/06/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1947 27/12/1947 8 days Heavy
Boiler number 3736 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1909 To Service To service as GCR Number 39
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Keadby (KEA)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 31/01/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1263 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 31/07/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
15/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1922. Dep: 16/09/1922.    
03/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1924. Dep: 23/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5039
   
18/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1927. Dep: 06/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 834 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
10/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1929. Dep: 21/09/1929.    
04/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1932. Dep: 11/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
22/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1934. Dep: 12/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 17/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 829 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
   
07/01/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
07/12/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
24/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
21/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
14/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3229    
23/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
07/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
20/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/12/1947. Dep: 27/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3736 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
04/12/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 3229 from Barnsley (36D)    

prev prev