Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 44 m/e 04/1909
LNER (1924) 5044   26/07/1924
LNER (1946) 3230   Not applied
LNER (1946) 9931   30/06/1946
BR 69931   27/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/104/1909
Q4/226/07/1924
Q1/228/01/1944
Wheels 0-8-0T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 04/1909 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Wed 26/11/1958 off Selby (50C)
Service Life 49 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 04/1909
LNG Langwith Junction m/e 11/1936
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 03/08/1943
LNG Langwith Junction 13/02/1944
MEX Mexborough 06/05/1944
SEL Selby 17/09/1944
GHD Gateshead 13/12/1944
SEL Selby 06/02/1949
   Withdrawn 26/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SEL Selby w/e 12/02/1949
WDN   26/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1365)
02/05/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1364)
29/09/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 837)
04/02/1922 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 845)
26/07/1924 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 552)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
05/01/1929 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 912)
09/05/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 595)
05/01/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 847)
14/08/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 595)
01/04/1939 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 835)
15/11/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3732)
28/01/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3723)
07/10/1950 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22994)
09/04/1955 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22983)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1914 02/05/1914   General
Boiler number 1364 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1917 29/09/1917   General
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1921 04/02/1922 64 days General
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1924 26/07/1924 141 days General
Boiler number 552 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5044
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1926 17/07/1926 85 days General  
Gorton Works 10/11/1928 05/01/1929 57 days General
Boiler number 912 (Diagram 17A)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 11/04/1931 09/05/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 595 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1934 05/01/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1937 14/08/1937 36 days General
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 595 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1939 01/04/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1941 15/11/1941 20 days General
Boiler number 3732 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Doncaster Works 24/11/1943 1 day Rebuilding
Tender sent to Gorton 6/12/43.
 
Doncaster Works 04/11/1944 10/11/1944 7 days Light Repair
Tanks leaking
 
Darlington Works 12/09/1946 28/09/1946 17 days Light Repair
Tank side fractured
 
Darlington Works 05/08/1947 19/09/1947 46 days General  
Darlington Works 04/09/1950 07/10/1950 34 days General
Boiler number 22994 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1955 09/04/1955 52 days General
Not repaired
Boiler number 22983 (Diagram 17A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1909 To Service To service as GCR Number 44
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 02/05/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1364 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 29/09/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
03/12/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1921. Dep: 04/02/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
08/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 26/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 552 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5044
   
24/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1926. Dep: 17/07/1926.    
10/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1928. Dep: 05/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 912 (Diagram 17A)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
11/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1931. Dep: 09/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 595 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1934. Dep: 05/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
10/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 14/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 595 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1939. Dep: 01/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 835 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
27/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1941. Dep: 15/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3732 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
24/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 24/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender sent to Gorton 6/12/43.
   
28/01/1944 Modification Diagram 17Sup number 3723 boiler fitted    
13/02/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
06/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
17/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
04/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/11/1944. Dep: 10/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tanks leaking
   
13/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 3230 but not taken up    
30/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9931    
12/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tank side fractured
   
05/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1947. Dep: 19/09/1947.    
27/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69931    
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
04/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1950. Dep: 07/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22994 (Diagram 17A)
   
17/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1955. Dep: 09/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
Boiler number 22983 (Diagram 17A)
   
26/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69931 from Selby (50C)    

prev prev