Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 48 m/e 05/1909
LNER (1924) 5048   11/10/1924
LNER (1946) 9928   07/04/1946
BR 69928   20/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/105/1909
Q4/207/10/1939
Q1/120/03/1943
Wheels 0-8-0T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 05/1909
Withdrawal Thu 20/08/1959 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 50 yrs, 3 mths , 21 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 22/8/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 14/07/1909
DON Doncaster 30/04/1928
ARD Ardsley 26/06/1936
BRN Barnsley 10/11/1937
LNG Langwith Junction 13/04/1943
IMM Immingham 28/08/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 01/10/1944
36C Frodingham 15/06/1958
   Withdrawn 20/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 14/07/1958
WDN   20/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1366)
23/08/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 868)
26/06/1920 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1264)
11/10/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1691)
02/11/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1817)
15/08/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1679)
09/12/1933 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 54)
07/10/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3723)
20/03/1943 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 912)
06/10/1945 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3762)
07/02/1948 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3744)
20/08/1949 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3763)
16/12/1950 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22981)
31/01/1953 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22991)
12/10/1957 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22984)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1913 23/08/1913   General
Boiler number 868 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1920 26/06/1920 99 days General
Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1922 11/11/1922 50 days General  
Gorton Works 29/03/1924 11/10/1924 197 days General
Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5048
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1926 15/01/1927 85 days General  
Gorton Works 02/07/1927 06/08/1927 36 days General
New L.H. cylinder
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1929 02/11/1929 22 days General
Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1931 15/08/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1679 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1933 09/12/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 11/04/1936 02/05/1936 22 days General  
Gorton Works 30/09/1939 07/10/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 3723 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Doncaster Works 04/01/1943 1 day Rebuilding
Tender sent to Gorton 20/1/43.
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1945 10/03/1945 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 01/09/1945 06/10/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 3762 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1948 07/02/1948 22 days Heavy
Boiler number 3744 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1949 20/08/1949 29 days General
Boiler number 3763 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69928
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1950 16/12/1950 27 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22981 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1952 31/01/1953 42 days General
Boiler number 22991 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1953 18/02/1953 14 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 21/08/1957 12/10/1957 53 days General
Boiler number 22984 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1957 19/10/1957 5 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1909 To Service To service as GCR Number 48
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
14/07/1909 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 23/08/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 868 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
20/03/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1920. Dep: 26/06/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/09/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1922. Dep: 11/11/1922.    
29/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 11/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5048
   
23/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1926. Dep: 15/01/1927.    
02/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1927. Dep: 06/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
   
30/04/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
25/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1931. Dep: 15/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1679 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
25/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
11/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1936. Dep: 02/05/1936.    
26/06/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
10/11/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
30/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3723 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
04/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 04/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender sent to Gorton 20/1/43.
   
20/03/1943 Modification Diagram 17A number 912 boiler fitted    
13/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
28/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
01/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
24/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945.    
01/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3762 (Diagram 17A)
   
07/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9928    
17/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/01/1948. Dep: 07/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3744 (Diagram 17A)
   
23/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3763 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69928
   
20/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1950. Dep: 16/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22981 (Diagram 17A)
   
21/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1952. Dep: 31/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22991 (Diagram 17A)
   
05/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1953. Dep: 18/02/1953.    
21/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1957. Dep: 12/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22984 (Diagram 17A)
   
15/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/10/1957. Dep: 19/10/1957.    
15/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
20/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69928 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev