Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 49 m/e 06/1909
LNER (1924) 5049   08/11/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/106/1909
Q4/231/08/1929
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 06/1909
Withdrawal Fri 17/11/1939 off Mexborough (MEX)
Service Life 30 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 18/11/39

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 13/08/1909
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 15/10/1926
MEX Mexborough 10/12/1926
DON Doncaster 28/04/1928
MEX Mexborough 23/02/1934
LNG Langwith Junction 16/11/1936
MEX Mexborough 06/05/1937
   Withdrawn 17/11/1939

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1367)
04/10/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1412)
22/07/1916 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1632)
06/05/1922 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1817)
08/11/1924 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1409)
31/08/1929 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
31/08/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1841)
15/08/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 647)
23/09/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1777)
11/07/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 850)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1913 04/10/1913   General
Boiler number 1412 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1916 22/07/1916   General
Boiler number 1632 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1922 06/05/1922 99 days General
Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1924 08/11/1924 148 days General
Boiler number 1409 (Diagram 4Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5049
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1927 09/04/1927 71 days General  
Gorton Works 03/08/1929 31/08/1929 29 days General
Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1931 15/08/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 647 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1933 23/09/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 1777 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1936 11/07/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1909 To Service To service as GCR Number 49
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
13/08/1909 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 04/10/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1412 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: 22/07/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1632 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1922. Dep: 06/05/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
14/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1924. Dep: 08/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1409 (Diagram 4Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5049
   
15/10/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
10/12/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
29/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1927. Dep: 09/04/1927.    
28/04/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1929. Dep: 31/08/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
25/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1931. Dep: 15/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 647 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
02/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1933. Dep: 23/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1777 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
20/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
16/11/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
06/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
17/11/1939 Withdrawn Condemned as 5049 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev