Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 62 m/e 06/1909
LNER (1924) 5062   16/02/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/106/1909
Q4/222/09/1928
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 06/1909 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Sat 08/05/1937 off Barnsley (BRN)
Service Life 27 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster m/e 07/1907
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 06/1909
MAR March 13/05/1928
IMM Immingham 02/03/1929
KEA Keadby 10/06/1929
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 10/04/1931
STV Staveley (G.C.) 20/06/1931
BRN Barnsley 25/01/1932
   Withdrawn 08/05/1937

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1368)
29/11/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1366)
31/05/1919 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 929)
16/02/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 374)
06/11/1926 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1267)
22/09/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 907)
22/09/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
03/06/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1772)
04/01/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 908)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1913 29/11/1913   General
Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1919 31/05/1919   General
Boiler number 929 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 16/07/1921 24/09/1921 71 days General  
Gorton Works 11/08/1923 16/02/1924 190 days General
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5062
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1926 06/11/1926 78 days General
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1928 22/09/1928 29 days General
Boiler number 907 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1930 04/10/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 28/03/1931 11/04/1931 15 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1933 03/06/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1772 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1935 04/01/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 908 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1907 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/1909 To Service To service as GCR Number 62
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 29/11/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 31/05/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 929 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
16/07/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1921. Dep: 24/09/1921.    
11/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1923. Dep: 16/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 374 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5062
   
21/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1926. Dep: 06/11/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
13/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
25/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1928. Dep: 22/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 907 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
02/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
10/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
23/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1930. Dep: 04/10/1930.    
28/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/03/1931. Dep: 11/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
10/04/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
20/06/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
25/01/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
27/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1772 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
21/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1935. Dep: 04/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 908 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
08/05/1937 Withdrawn Condemned as 5062 from Barnsley (BRN)    

prev prev