|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1914 | 25/07/1914 | General | Boiler number 1371 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1920 | 10/07/1920 | General | Boiler number 352 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1922 | 19/08/1922 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1924 | 26/07/1924 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5063 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1926 | 25/12/1926 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1929 | 23/03/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 46A (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1930 | 18/10/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1933 | 10/06/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1909 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 63 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Keadby (KEA) Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted |
||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 25/07/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1371 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 10/07/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 352 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
17/06/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1922. Dep: 19/08/1922. | ||
17/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1924. Dep: 26/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5063 |
||
16/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1926. Dep: 25/12/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
09/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1929. Dep: 23/03/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 46A (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
27/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1930. Dep: 18/10/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1138 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
01/11/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
27/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1933. Dep: 10/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
22/06/1936 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5063 from Immingham (IMM) |