Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 767 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4627 Week
» 7209 Month
» 271842 Year
» 1493407 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 5212 m/e 08/1909

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/108/1909
Q4/223/01/1915
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 08/1909 to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Withdrawal Sat 12/03/1938 off Barnsley (BRN)
Service Life 28 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STV Staveley (G.C.) (New) m/e 08/1909
BRN Barnsley 30/03/1932
   Withdrawn 12/03/1938

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1370)
23/01/1915 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1405)
28/02/1920 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1369)
02/07/1927 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 829)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
11/02/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 916)
09/11/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 892)


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1909 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 5212
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
23/01/1915 Modification Diagram 4Sat number 1405 boiler fitted    
28/02/1920 Modification Diagram 17Sup number 1369 boiler fitted    
02/07/1927 Modification Diagram 17Sup number 829 boiler fitted    
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
30/03/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
11/02/1933 Modification Diagram 17Sup number 22997 boiler fitted    
11/02/1933 Modification Diagram 17Sup number 916 boiler fitted    
09/11/1935 Modification Diagram 17Sup number 892 boiler fitted    
12/03/1938 Withdrawn Condemned as 5212 from Barnsley (BRN)    

prev prev