Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 68 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1015 Week
» 19797 Month
» 268090 Year
» 1152471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 213 m/e 09/1909
LNER (1924) 5213   15/01/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/109/1909
Q4/208/01/1921
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 09/1909 to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Withdrawal Wed 13/07/1938 off Barnsley (BRN)
Service Life 28 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend (New) m/e 09/1909
CLK Colwick 21/01/1927
STV Staveley (G.C.) 05/04/1927
BRN Barnsley 29/03/1932
   Withdrawn 13/07/1938

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1371)
28/02/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1270)
08/01/1921 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1372)
05/10/1929 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
05/10/1929 Diagram 19A boiler fitted (number 592)
05/08/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 906)
17/08/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1678)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1914 28/02/1914   General
Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1920 08/01/1921 64 days General
Boiler number 1372 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1923 29/12/1923 71 days General  
Gorton Works 13/11/1926 15/01/1927 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5213
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1929 05/10/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 592 (Diagram 19A)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1931 09/05/1931 22 days General  
Gorton Works 22/07/1933 05/08/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1935 17/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1678 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1909 To Service To service as GCR Number 213
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 28/02/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
06/11/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1920. Dep: 08/01/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1372 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
20/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1923. Dep: 29/12/1923.    
13/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1926. Dep: 15/01/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5213
   
21/01/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
05/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
24/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1929. Dep: 05/10/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 592 (Diagram 19A)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
18/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1931. Dep: 09/05/1931.    
29/03/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
22/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 05/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 906 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1678 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/07/1938 Withdrawn Condemned as 5213 from Barnsley (BRN)    

prev prev