Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 925 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1850 Week
» 19186 Month
» 296982 Year
» 1181363 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 159 m/e 10/1909
LNER (1924) 5159   15/08/1925
LNER (1946) 3231   23/01/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/110/1909
Q4/226/05/1928
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 10/1909
Withdrawal Mon 20/03/1950 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 40 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 25/3/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 11/10/1912
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 15/10/1926
MEX Mexborough 07/12/1926
ARD Ardsley 12/06/1928
   Withdrawn 20/03/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1909 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1373)
23/10/1915 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1373)
07/02/1920 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1634)
29/01/1921 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 54)
26/05/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 850)
01/08/1931 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
01/08/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 837)
28/04/1934 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 914)
17/10/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 185)
12/08/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 869)
25/10/1941 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 838)
16/01/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 910)
19/05/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3737)
05/04/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3724)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 27/03/1915 23/10/1915 211 days General
Superheater installed
Boiler number 1373 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1919 07/02/1920 57 days General
Boiler number 1634 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1920 29/01/1921 43 days General
Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1923 26/05/1923 71 days General  
Gorton Works 02/05/1925 15/08/1925 106 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5159
 
Gorton Works 07/04/1928 26/05/1928 50 days General
Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1931 01/08/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 07/04/1934 28/04/1934 22 days General
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 914 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1936 17/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1939 12/08/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1941 25/10/1941 18 days General
Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1943 16/01/1943 11 days General
Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1945 19/05/1945 29 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1947 05/04/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3724 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1909 To Service To service as GCR Number 159
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
11/10/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
27/03/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1915. Dep: 23/10/1915.
Work undertaken:
Superheater installed
Boiler number 1373 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/12/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1919. Dep: 07/02/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1634 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/12/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1920. Dep: 29/01/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
17/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1923. Dep: 26/05/1923.    
02/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1925. Dep: 15/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5159
   
15/10/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
07/12/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
07/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
11/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 01/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
07/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 914 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
03/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 185 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
29/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
08/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1941. Dep: 25/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
06/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1943. Dep: 16/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
21/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 19/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3231    
08/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3724 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
20/03/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 3231 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev