Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 522 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2429 Week
» 21211 Month
» 269504 Year
» 1153885 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 160 m/e 11/1909
LNER (1924) 5160   01/11/1924
LNER (1946) 3232   20/01/1946
BR 63232 w/e 07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/111/1909
Q4/222/10/1927
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 11/1909
Withdrawal Mon 05/06/1950 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 40 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 10/6/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 11/01/1913
KEA Keadby 23/02/1920
ARD Ardsley 01/11/1927
   Withdrawn 05/06/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN 37A Ardsley 05/06/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1374)
23/10/1915 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 869)
22/01/1921 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 47)
22/10/1927 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 836)
27/09/1930 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
25/06/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 468)
26/10/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 874)
25/06/1938 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 833)
12/04/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3725)
03/07/1943 Diagram 19A boiler fitted (number 903)
24/02/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3736)
15/11/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 874)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1915 23/10/1915   General
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1920 22/01/1921 36 days General
Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1923 02/06/1923 106 days General  
Gorton Works 16/08/1924 01/11/1924 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5160
 
Gorton Works 16/07/1927 22/10/1927 99 days General
Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1930 27/09/1930 43 days General
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1932 25/06/1932 36 days General
New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves
Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1935 26/10/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/06/1938 25/06/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1941 12/04/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1943 03/07/1943 8 days General
Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1945 24/02/1945 29 days Heavy
Boiler number 3736 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1946 27/07/1946 22 days Light Repair
Broken L.H. cylinder
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1947 15/11/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1948 1 day Light Repair
Tender only
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1909 To Service To service as GCR Number 160
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
11/01/1913 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 23/10/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/02/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
18/12/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1920. Dep: 22/01/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
17/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1923. Dep: 02/06/1923.    
16/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1924. Dep: 01/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5160
   
16/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1927. Dep: 22/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
01/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
16/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1930. Dep: 27/09/1930.
Work undertaken:
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
21/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves
Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1935. Dep: 26/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
29/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1941. Dep: 12/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
26/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A)
   
27/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/01/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3736 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3232    
06/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/07/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Broken L.H. cylinder
   
25/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1947. Dep: 15/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63232    
07/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
05/06/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 63232 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev