Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 140 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1180 Week
» 11350 Month
» 289146 Year
» 1173527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 161 m/e 11/1909
LNER (1924) 5161   05/04/1924
LNER (1946) 3233   27/01/1946
BR 63233 w/e 19/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/111/1909
Q4/201/09/1928
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 11/1909
Withdrawal Mon 06/02/1950 off Barnsley (36D)
Service Life 40 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 11/2/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STV Staveley (G.C.) 04/01/1913
BRN Barnsley m/e 1935
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947
   Withdrawn 06/02/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947
WDN 36D Barnsley 06/02/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1909 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1375)
12/12/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 861)
05/04/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 439)
01/09/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 495)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
01/11/1930 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1911)
14/01/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 138)
27/04/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 907)
24/07/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 601)
13/01/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 832)
26/09/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 875)
24/02/1945 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 852)
20/09/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 138)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1914 12/12/1914   General
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 23/04/1921 11/06/1921 50 days General  
Gorton Works 20/10/1923 05/04/1924 169 days General
Boiler number 439 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5161
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1925 06/02/1926 57 days General  
Gorton Works 11/08/1928 01/09/1928 22 days General
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1930 01/11/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1911 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1932 14/01/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1935 27/04/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 907 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1937 24/07/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 601 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1939 13/01/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1942 26/09/1942 13 days General
Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1945 24/02/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1947 20/09/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1949 19/02/1949 22 days Heavy Casual
Secondhand cylinders ex-B9 1478
Renumbered to BR 63233
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1909 To Service To service as GCR Number 161
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
04/01/1913 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 12/12/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
23/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1921. Dep: 11/06/1921.    
20/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1923. Dep: 05/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 439 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5161
   
12/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1925. Dep: 06/02/1926.    
11/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1928. Dep: 01/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
11/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1930. Dep: 01/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1911 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
31/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1932. Dep: 14/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1935 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
13/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1935. Dep: 27/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 907 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
10/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 601 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
14/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
20/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
27/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3233    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
23/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1947. Dep: 20/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
29/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1949. Dep: 19/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Secondhand cylinders ex-B9 1478
Renumbered to BR 63233
   
06/02/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 63233 from Barnsley (36D)    

prev prev