Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3115 Week
» 14686 Month
» 262979 Year
» 1147360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 162 m/e 12/1909
LNER (1924) 5162   10/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3234   27/01/1946
BR 63234 w/e 16/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/112/1909
Q4/220/03/1915
Q4/120/05/1944
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 12/1909
Withdrawal Mon 05/03/1951 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 41 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 10/3/51

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 18/10/1912
KEA Keadby m/e 1922
IMM Immingham 12/10/1930
MEX Mexborough 08/01/1938
GRA Grantham 23/02/1947
37A Ardsley 04/06/1950
   Withdrawn 05/03/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GRA Grantham 23/02/1947
ALLOC 37A Ardsley m/e 30/06/1950
WDN   05/03/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1909 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1376)
20/03/1915 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 844)
25/12/1920 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1912)
07/08/1926 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 728)
05/01/1929 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
04/10/1930 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1711)
08/04/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 333)
12/01/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 641)
07/08/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 913)
20/03/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 850)
20/05/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3725)
06/09/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 918)
16/04/1949 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 3774)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1915 20/03/1915   General
Boiler number 844 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1920 25/12/1920 169 days General
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1924 10/05/1924 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5162
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1926 07/08/1926 106 days General
Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1928 05/01/1929 43 days General
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1930 04/10/1930 36 days General
Boiler number 1711 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1933 08/04/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1934 12/01/1935 36 days General
Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1937 07/08/1937 15 days General
Secondhand R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1940 31/08/1940 36 days General
New cylinders
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1943 20/03/1943 17 days General
Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1944 20/05/1944 8 days General
Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1945 16/06/1945 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 16/08/1947 06/09/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1949 16/04/1949 8 days Heavy
Boiler number 3774 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to BR 63234
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1909 To Service To service as GCR Number 162
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
18/10/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 20/03/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 844 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
10/07/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1920. Dep: 25/12/1920.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1922 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
08/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 10/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5162
   
24/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1926. Dep: 07/08/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
24/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1928. Dep: 05/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
30/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1930. Dep: 04/10/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1711 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
12/10/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
25/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1933. Dep: 08/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
08/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1934. Dep: 12/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
24/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Secondhand R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
08/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
27/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1940. Dep: 31/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
   
04/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
02/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945.    
27/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3234    
23/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
16/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
09/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/04/1949. Dep: 16/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3774 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to BR 63234
   
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
05/03/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63234 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev