Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 706 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1653 Week
» 20435 Month
» 268728 Year
» 1153109 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 163 m/e 12/1909
LNER (1924) 5163   12/07/1924
LNER (1946) 3235   03/02/1946
BR (Tmp) E3235   13/03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/112/1909
Q4/213/12/1930
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 12/1909
Withdrawal Mon 07/05/1951 off Barnsley (36D)
Service Life 41 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 26/5/51

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 19/05/1912
ARD Ardsley 17/01/1928
KEA Keadby 10/10/1929
IMM Immingham 12/12/1930
LIN Lincoln 03/05/1942
NWE New England 12/12/1943
NWE New England (M&GNR) 27/08/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 28/10/1945
BRN Barnsley 07/04/1946
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947
   Withdrawn 07/05/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1377)
16/05/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1385)
10/07/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 838)
06/08/1927 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1902)
16/03/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 530)
13/12/1930 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
13/12/1930 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 722)
13/05/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 651)
11/01/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 468)
09/07/1938 Diagram 19A boiler fitted (number 903)
08/02/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3727)
01/05/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3742)
08/09/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3741)
13/03/1948 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 830)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1914 16/05/1914   General
Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1920 10/07/1920   General
Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1922 23/12/1922 64 days General  
Gorton Works 03/05/1924 12/07/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5163
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1927 06/08/1927 43 days General
Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1929 16/03/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1930 13/12/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1933 13/05/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 651 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1935 11/01/1936 22 days General
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1938 09/07/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1941 08/02/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3727 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/04/1943 01/05/1943 24 days General
Boiler number 3742 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1945 08/09/1945 29 days General
Secondhand R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 3741 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1948 13/03/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3235
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1909 To Service To service as GCR Number 163
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
19/05/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 16/05/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 10/07/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
21/10/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1922. Dep: 23/12/1922.    
03/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5163
   
25/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 06/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
17/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
02/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1929. Dep: 16/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
10/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
22/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1930. Dep: 13/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
12/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
06/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1933. Dep: 13/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 651 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
21/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1935. Dep: 11/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
25/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A)
   
25/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3727 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/05/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
08/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3742 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
27/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE) (M&GNR)    
11/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Secondhand R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 3741 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
03/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3235    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
21/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1948. Dep: 13/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3235
   
07/05/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 3235 from Barnsley (36D)    

prev prev