Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5915 Week
» 13099 Month
» 321080 Year
» 1205461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 164 m/e 12/1909
LNER (1924) 5164   28/06/1924
LNER (1946) 3236   24/02/1946
BR 63236 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/112/1909
Q4/229/09/1928
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 12/1909
Withdrawal Sat 26/05/1951 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 41 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 27/04/1912
KEA Keadby m/e 1923
FRO Frodingham 18/06/1932
BRN Barnsley 19/02/1939
ARD Ardsley 04/05/1939
   Withdrawn 26/05/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   26/05/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1378)
11/04/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 352)
29/11/1919 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1822)
28/06/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 550)
29/09/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 910)
29/09/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
06/06/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 552)
17/02/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 834)
20/06/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 47)
29/10/1938 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 893)
13/03/1943 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 838)
08/12/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3742)
15/05/1948 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3734)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1914 11/04/1914   General
Boiler number 352 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1919 29/11/1919   General
Boiler number 1822 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1921 11/02/1922 71 days General  
Gorton Works 01/03/1924 28/06/1924 120 days General
Boiler number 550 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5164
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1926 15/01/1927 85 days General  
Gorton Works 25/08/1928 29/09/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1931 06/06/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 552 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1934 17/02/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 834 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1936 20/06/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1938 29/10/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1940 25/05/1940 29 days General
After collision
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1943 13/03/1943 18 days General
Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 03/01/1944 08/01/1944 6 days Light Repair
New R.H. cylinder
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1945 08/12/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 3742 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1948 15/05/1948 22 days General
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 3734 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63236
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1909 To Service To service as GCR Number 164
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
27/04/1912 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 11/04/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 352 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 29/11/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1822 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
03/12/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1921. Dep: 11/02/1922.    
1923 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
01/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 550 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5164
   
23/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1926. Dep: 15/01/1927.    
25/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1928. Dep: 29/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
16/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 552 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
03/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 17/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 834 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1938. Dep: 29/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/02/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
04/05/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
27/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
24/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1943. Dep: 13/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
03/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1944. Dep: 08/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
   
24/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3742 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
24/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3236    
24/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1948. Dep: 15/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 3734 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63236
   
26/05/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63236 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev