Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 704 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1651 Week
» 20433 Month
» 268726 Year
» 1153107 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 401 m/e 06/1910
LNER (1924) 5401   02/02/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 06/1910 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Wed 22/12/1937 off Mexborough (MEX)
Service Life 27 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 06/1910
   Withdrawn 22/12/1937

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1399)
22/10/1921 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 866)
02/02/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 336)
26/01/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 312)
21/03/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1832)
30/06/1934 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 201)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 01/07/1916 16/12/1916 169 days General
Returned to UK 16/5/19
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1919 09/08/1919 43 days General  
Gorton Works 23/07/1921 22/10/1921 92 days General
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1923 02/02/1924 183 days General
Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5401
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1926 05/06/1926 71 days General  
Gorton Works 10/11/1928 26/01/1929 78 days General
Boiler number 312 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1931 21/03/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1934 30/06/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 201 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 401
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
01/07/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1916. Dep: 16/12/1916.
Work undertaken:
Returned to UK 16/5/19
   
28/06/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1919. Dep: 09/08/1919.    
23/07/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1921. Dep: 22/10/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
04/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1923. Dep: 02/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5401
   
27/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1926. Dep: 05/06/1926.    
10/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1928. Dep: 26/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 312 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
07/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1931. Dep: 21/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
16/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1934. Dep: 30/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 201 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
22/12/1937 Withdrawn Condemned as 5401 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev