Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 956 m/e 08/1910
LNER (1924) 5956   18/04/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/108/1910
Q4/229/05/1915
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 08/1910 to Keadby (KEA)
Withdrawal Tue 04/07/1939 off Immingham (IMM)
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KEA Keadby (New) m/e 08/1910
IMM Immingham 07/11/1931
   Withdrawn 04/07/1939

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1404)
29/05/1915 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1271)
31/07/1920 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1903)
31/03/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1920)
31/10/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1916)
31/10/1931 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
14/07/1934 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 842)
20/03/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1920)
21/08/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 907)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1915 29/05/1915   General
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1920 31/07/1920   General
Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1922 13/01/1923 64 days General  
Gorton Works 31/01/1925 18/04/1925 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5956
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1928 31/03/1928 64 days General
Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1929 07/12/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 10/10/1931 31/10/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1934 14/07/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/03/1937 20/03/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1937 21/08/1937 15 days Heavy
Boiler number 907 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 956
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Keadby (KEA)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 29/05/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 31/07/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/11/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1922. Dep: 13/01/1923.    
31/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1925. Dep: 18/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5956
   
28/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1928. Dep: 31/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
02/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1929. Dep: 07/12/1929.    
10/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1931. Dep: 31/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
07/11/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
30/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
06/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1937. Dep: 20/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/08/1937. Dep: 21/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 907 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
04/07/1939 Withdrawn Condemned as 5956 from Immingham (IMM)    

prev prev