Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 100 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2085 Week
» 9269 Month
» 317250 Year
» 1201631 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 957 m/e 08/1910
LNER (1924) 5957   02/05/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/108/1910
Q4/226/11/1927
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 08/1910 to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Withdrawal Tue 28/04/1936 off Langwith Junction (LNG)
Service Life 25 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction (New) m/e 08/1910
   Withdrawn 28/04/1936

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1405)
24/10/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1365)
01/11/1919 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1817)
11/03/1922 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1272)
15/12/1923 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 319)
26/11/1927 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 47)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
17/10/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 911)
24/03/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 640)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1914 24/10/1914   General
Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1919 01/11/1919   General
Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1922 11/03/1922 50 days General
Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1923 15/12/1923 155 days General
Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1925 02/05/1925 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5957
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1927 26/11/1927 92 days General
Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1929 16/11/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 26/09/1931 17/10/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1934 24/03/1934 15 days General
Not repaired
Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 957
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 24/10/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 01/11/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1817 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
21/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1922. Dep: 11/03/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
14/07/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1923. Dep: 15/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 319 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 02/05/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5957
   
27/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 26/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
12/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 16/11/1929.    
26/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1931. Dep: 17/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
10/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1934. Dep: 24/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/04/1936 Withdrawn Condemned as 5957 from Langwith Junction (LNG)    

prev prev