Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 958 m/e 08/1910
LNER (1924) 5958   18/10/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/108/1910
Q4/210/12/1927
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 08/1910 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Fri 05/03/1937 off Langwith Junction (LNG)
Service Life 26 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 6/3/37

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 08/1910
DON Doncaster m/e 07/1924
MEX Mexborough 19/05/1925
LNG Langwith Junction 07/05/1930
   Withdrawn 05/03/1937

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1406)
24/06/1916 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 237)
25/12/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 40)
10/12/1927 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1400)
26/04/1930 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
26/04/1930 Diagram 19A boiler fitted (number 903)
19/11/1932 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1682)
02/02/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1918)
02/02/1935 Modified to conform to GCR Gauge


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1916 24/06/1916   General
Boiler number 237 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1920 25/12/1920 50 days General
Boiler number 40 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1923 07/04/1923 50 days General  
Gorton Works 02/08/1924 18/10/1924 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5958
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1927 10/12/1927 106 days General
Boiler number 1400 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1930 26/04/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1932 19/11/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1682 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1935 02/02/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1918 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 958
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: 24/06/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 237 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
06/11/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1920. Dep: 25/12/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 40 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
17/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1923. Dep: 07/04/1923.    
07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1924. Dep: 18/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5958
   
19/05/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
27/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 10/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1400 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
29/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1930. Dep: 26/04/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
07/05/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
12/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1932. Dep: 19/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1682 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1935. Dep: 02/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1918 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to GCR Gauge
   
05/03/1937 Withdrawn Condemned as 5958 from Langwith Junction (LNG)    

prev prev