Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 418 Today
» 937 Yesterday
» 1355 Week
» 8539 Month
» 316520 Year
» 1200901 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 959 m/e 09/1910
LNER (1924) 5959   22/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3237   Not applied
LNER (1946) 9932   07/04/1946
BR 69932   03/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/109/1910
Q4/227/02/1915
Q1/204/03/1944
Wheels 0-8-0T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 09/1910
Withdrawal Wed 12/11/1958 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 48 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 15/11/58

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction 21/06/1913
ARD Ardsley 18/05/1931
MEX Mexborough 14/04/1944
SHF Sheffield Darnall 02/07/1944
MEX Mexborough 17/08/1944
DON Doncaster 25/08/1946
FRO Frodingham 24/09/1946
   Withdrawn 12/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   12/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1407)
27/02/1915 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1375)
14/08/1920 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1405)
06/11/1926 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1912)
28/02/1931 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
28/02/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 640)
13/01/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 851)
18/07/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 831)
03/06/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 643)
01/11/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3731)
1944 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3745)
21/06/1947 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3765)
03/12/1949 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3755)
21/08/1952 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22989)
16/04/1955 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22988)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1915 27/02/1915   General
Boiler number 1375 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 1920 14/08/1920   General
Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1922 16/09/1922 92 days General  
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 22/03/1924 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5959
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1926 06/11/1926 134 days General
Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1929 23/02/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 14/02/1931 28/02/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1933 13/01/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1936 18/07/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1939 03/06/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1941 01/11/1941 17 days General
Boiler number 3731 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1942 01/08/1942 9 days Light Repair
Suspected loose wheel
 
Doncaster Works 17/01/1944 1 day Rebuilding
Tender sent to Gorton 14/4/44.
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1947 21/06/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3765 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1949 03/12/1949 26 days General
Boiler number 3755 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69932
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1952 16/08/1952 28 days General  
Gorton Works 19/08/1952 21/08/1952 3 days Unclassified
Boiler number 22989 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1955 16/04/1955 46 days General
Boiler number 22988 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1955 26/04/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/10/1956 03/11/1956 34 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 06/11/1956 07/11/1956 2 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 959
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
21/06/1913 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 27/02/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1375 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 14/08/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1405 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
17/06/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1922. Dep: 16/09/1922.    
02/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5959
   
26/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1926. Dep: 06/11/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
19/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1929. Dep: 23/02/1929.    
14/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1931. Dep: 28/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
18/05/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
30/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1933. Dep: 13/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 851 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
04/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
20/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1939. Dep: 03/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
16/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1941. Dep: 01/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3731 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
24/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/07/1942. Dep: 01/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Suspected loose wheel
   
1944 Modification Diagram 17A number 3745 boiler fitted    
17/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 17/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender sent to Gorton 14/4/44.
   
14/04/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/07/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
17/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 3237 but not taken up    
07/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9932    
25/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
24/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
17/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3765 (Diagram 17A)
   
08/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3755 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69932
   
20/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1952. Dep: 16/08/1952.    
19/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1952. Dep: 21/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22989 (Diagram 17A)
   
02/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1955. Dep: 16/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22988 (Diagram 17A)
   
25/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 26/04/1955.    
01/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/10/1956. Dep: 03/11/1956.    
06/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1956. Dep: 07/11/1956.    
12/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69932 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev