Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 572 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3715 Week
» 13885 Month
» 291681 Year
» 1176062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 960 m/e 10/1910
LNER (1924) 5960   28/02/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/110/1910
Q4/215/07/1916
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 10/1910 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Sat 02/05/1936 off Mexborough (MEX)
Service Life 25 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 10/1910
DON Doncaster m/e 07/1924
MEX Mexborough 17/02/1934
   Withdrawn 02/05/1936

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1408)
15/07/1916 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1408)
16/10/1920 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1920)
24/12/1927 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 891)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
19/03/1932 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 336)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/12/1915 15/07/1916 222 days General
Superheater installed
Boiler number 1408 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 17/07/1920 16/10/1920 92 days General
Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1922 03/02/1923 57 days General  
Gorton Works 06/12/1924 28/02/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5960
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1927 24/12/1927 43 days General
Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1930 22/02/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 05/03/1932 19/03/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 960
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
07/12/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1915. Dep: 15/07/1916.
Work undertaken:
Superheater installed
Boiler number 1408 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
17/07/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1920. Dep: 16/10/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
09/12/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1922. Dep: 03/02/1923.    
07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/12/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1924. Dep: 28/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5960
   
12/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 24/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
18/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930.    
05/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
17/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/05/1936 Withdrawn Condemned as 5960 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev