Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 524 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2431 Week
» 21213 Month
» 269506 Year
» 1153887 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 961 m/e 11/1910
LNER (1924) 5961   24/10/1925
LNER (1946) 9926   11/08/1946
BR 69926   11/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/111/1910
Q4/216/01/1937
Q1/121/11/1942
Wheels 0-8-0T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 11/1910
Withdrawal Mon 03/02/1958 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 47 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 15/09/1916
DON Doncaster 16/02/1924
FRO Frodingham 31/01/1936
MEX Mexborough 22/08/1939
CAM Cambridge 01/10/1945
MAR March 21/10/1948
36C Frodingham 08/04/1951
   Withdrawn 03/02/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March w/e 23/10/1948
ALLOC 36C Frodingham w/e 14/04/1951
WDN   03/02/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1411)
13/08/1921 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1266)
24/10/1925 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1711)
03/05/1930 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1822)
16/07/1932 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 431)
01/09/1934 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1832)
16/01/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 905)
16/01/1937 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
08/07/1939 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 912)
21/11/1942 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3739)
11/09/1948 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3762)
25/01/1952 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22988)
01/10/1954 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22985)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/06/1921 13/08/1921 64 days General
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1923 07/07/1923 29 days General  
Gorton Works 29/08/1925 24/10/1925 57 days General
Boiler number 1711 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5961
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1928 10/03/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 12/04/1930 03/05/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1822 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1932 16/07/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1934 01/09/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1936 16/01/1937 17 days General
Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1939 08/07/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 912 (Diagram 17A)
 
Doncaster Works 06/10/1942 1 day Rebuilding
Tender sent to Gorton 1/1/43.
 
Doncaster Works 20/09/1943 26/09/1943 7 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 01/12/1945 05/01/1946 36 days General  
Gorton Works 07/08/1948 11/09/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 3762 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69926
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1951 25/01/1952 42 days General
Boiler number 22988 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1954 01/10/1954 42 days General
Boiler number 22985 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1955 19/05/1955 64 days Unclassified
Not repaired
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 961
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
15/09/1916 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
11/06/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1921. Dep: 13/08/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1923. Dep: 07/07/1923.    
16/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
29/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1925. Dep: 24/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1711 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5961
   
28/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1928. Dep: 10/03/1928.    
12/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1822 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 16/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
18/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1934. Dep: 01/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
31/01/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
31/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 16/01/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
24/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 912 (Diagram 17A)
   
22/08/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
06/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 06/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender sent to Gorton 1/1/43.
   
21/11/1942 Modification Diagram 17A number 3739 boiler fitted    
20/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1943. Dep: 26/09/1943.    
01/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
01/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946.    
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9926    
07/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1948. Dep: 11/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3762 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69926
   
21/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
08/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
15/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1951. Dep: 25/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22988 (Diagram 17A)
   
21/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1954. Dep: 01/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22985 (Diagram 17A)
   
17/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/03/1955. Dep: 19/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
   
03/02/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69926 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev