|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/06/1921 | 13/08/1921 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1923 | 07/07/1923 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1925 | 24/10/1925 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1711 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5961 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1928 | 10/03/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1930 | 03/05/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1822 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/07/1932 | 16/07/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1934 | 01/09/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1936 | 16/01/1937 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1939 | 08/07/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 912 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1942 | 1 day | Rebuilding | Tender sent to Gorton 1/1/43. |
|||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1943 | 26/09/1943 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1945 | 05/01/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1948 | 11/09/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3762 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to BR 69926 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1951 | 25/01/1952 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 22988 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1954 | 01/10/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 22985 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1955 | 19/05/1955 | 64 days | Unclassified | Not repaired |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1910 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 961 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
15/09/1916 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
11/06/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1921. Dep: 13/08/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
09/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1923. Dep: 07/07/1923. | ||
16/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
29/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1925. Dep: 24/10/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1711 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5961 |
||
28/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1928. Dep: 10/03/1928. | ||
12/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1822 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
09/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 16/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
18/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1934. Dep: 01/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1832 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
31/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
31/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 16/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
24/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 912 (Diagram 17A) |
||
22/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
06/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 06/10/1942. Work undertaken: Tender sent to Gorton 1/1/43. |
||
21/11/1942 | Modification | Diagram 17A number 3739 boiler fitted | ||
20/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1943. Dep: 26/09/1943. | ||
01/10/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
01/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946. | ||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9926 | ||
07/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1948. Dep: 11/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3762 (Diagram 17A) Renumbered to BR 69926 |
||
21/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
23/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
08/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
14/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
15/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1951. Dep: 25/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22988 (Diagram 17A) |
||
21/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1954. Dep: 01/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22985 (Diagram 17A) |
||
17/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/03/1955. Dep: 19/05/1955. Work undertaken: Not repaired |
||
03/02/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69926 from Frodingham (36C) |