Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 962 m/e 11/1910
LNER (1924) 5962 m/e 02/1924
LNER (1946) 3238   10/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/111/1910
Q4/218/01/1936
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 11/1910
Withdrawal Mon 06/02/1950 off Barnsley (36D)
Service Life 39 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 11/2/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 08/02/1911
DON Doncaster 31/01/1924
MAR March 14/07/1925
STV Staveley (G.C.) 14/03/1929
BRN Barnsley 05/09/1943
LNG Langwith Junction 23/09/1944
BRN Barnsley 07/04/1946
LNG Langwith Junction 27/10/1946
BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947
   Withdrawn 06/02/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC BRN Barnsley 05/10/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1910 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1412)
09/08/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 853)
09/11/1918 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 842)
05/01/1924 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 333)
14/01/1928 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 40)
16/08/1930 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 54)
27/05/1933 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 312)
18/01/1936 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
18/01/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3721)
12/02/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 728)
14/12/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 891)
18/09/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 468)
26/04/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3730)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1913 09/08/1913   General
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1918 09/11/1918 148 days General
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1921 25/06/1921 36 days General  
Gorton Works 28/07/1923 05/01/1924 162 days General
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1927 14/01/1928 57 days General
Boiler number 40 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1930 16/08/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1933 27/05/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 312 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1935 18/01/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 3721 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1938 12/02/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1940 14/12/1940 15 days General
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 09/09/1943 18/09/1943 10 days Heavy
Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1947 26/04/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3730 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 962
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
08/02/1911 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 09/08/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
15/06/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1918. Dep: 09/11/1918.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
21/05/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1921. Dep: 25/06/1921.    
28/07/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1923. Dep: 05/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
31/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5962    
14/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
19/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1927. Dep: 14/01/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 40 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
14/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
19/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1930. Dep: 16/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 54 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
13/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1933. Dep: 27/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 312 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
28/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3721 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
29/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1938. Dep: 12/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 891 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
05/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
09/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/09/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3238    
22/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3730 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
06/02/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 3238 from Barnsley (36D)    

prev prev