Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 1018 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3117 Week
» 14688 Month
» 262981 Year
» 1147362 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 963 y/e 1910
LNER (1924) 5963   30/01/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/11910
Q4/230/01/1926
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During y/e 1910 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Sat 03/10/1936 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 26 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) y/e 1910
DON Doncaster m/e 07/1924
MAR March 24/01/1929
ANN Annesley 09/03/1929
ARD Ardsley 22/05/1931
   Withdrawn 03/10/1936

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
1910 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1413)
26/02/1916 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1414)
27/11/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 862)
30/01/1926 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 651)
26/01/1929 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
21/03/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 914)
31/03/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 552)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/04/1913 05/07/1913 71 days General  
Gorton Works 21/08/1915 26/02/1916 190 days General
Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1920 27/11/1920 71 days General
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1923 19/05/1923 85 days General  
Gorton Works 28/11/1925 30/01/1926 64 days General
Boiler number 651 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5963
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1928 26/01/1929 43 days General
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1931 21/03/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 914 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1934 31/03/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 552 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 963
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
26/04/1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1913. Dep: 05/07/1913.    
21/08/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1915. Dep: 26/02/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/09/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1920. Dep: 27/11/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
24/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1923. Dep: 19/05/1923.    
07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
28/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1925. Dep: 30/01/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 651 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5963
   
15/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1928. Dep: 26/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
24/01/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
09/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
28/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1931. Dep: 21/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 914 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
22/05/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
10/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1934. Dep: 31/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 552 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/10/1936 Withdrawn Condemned as 5963 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev