Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 998 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7118 Week
» 18689 Month
» 266982 Year
» 1151363 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 964 m/e 12/1910
LNER (1924) 5964   28/06/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/112/1910
Q4/208/08/1931
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 12/1910 to Immingham (IMM)
Withdrawal Tue 30/08/1938 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 27 yrs , 9 mths

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham (New) m/e 12/1910
ARD Ardsley 01/10/1927
KEA Keadby 10/10/1929
FRO Frodingham 18/06/1932
   Withdrawn 30/08/1938

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1910 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1414)
19/02/1916 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1413)
26/11/1921 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1399)
28/06/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1822)
04/05/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1916)
08/08/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1650)
02/12/1933 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
02/12/1933 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 840)
28/03/1936 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1696)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/08/1915 19/02/1916 197 days General
Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1921 26/11/1921 57 days General
Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1924 28/06/1924 113 days General
Boiler number 1822 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5964
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1927 17/09/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 06/04/1929 04/05/1929 29 days General
Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1931 08/08/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1650 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1933 02/12/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 840 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1936 28/03/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 964
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Immingham (IMM)
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
07/08/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1915. Dep: 19/02/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
01/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1921. Dep: 26/11/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
08/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1822 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5964
   
30/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1927. Dep: 17/09/1927.    
01/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
06/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1929. Dep: 04/05/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
10/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
18/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1931. Dep: 08/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1650 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
11/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1933. Dep: 02/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 840 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
14/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
30/08/1938 Withdrawn Condemned as 5964 from Frodingham (FRO)    

prev prev