Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 965 m/e 12/1910
LNER (1924) 5965   05/06/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 12/1910 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Sat 29/10/1938 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 27 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 12/1910
DON Doncaster m/e 1924
ARD Ardsley 13/11/1934
   Withdrawn 29/10/1938

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1910 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1415)
25/06/1921 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 237)
18/02/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 898)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
27/08/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 834)
03/02/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 910)
03/10/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3725)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/12/1915 24/06/1916 197 days General
Superheater installed
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1921 25/06/1921 99 days General
Boiler number 237 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1923 20/10/1923 85 days General  
Gorton Works 27/02/1926 05/06/1926 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5965
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1927 18/02/1928 71 days General
Boiler number 898 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1930 21/06/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 13/08/1932 27/08/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 834 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1934 03/02/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1936 03/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 965
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted
   
11/12/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1915. Dep: 24/06/1916.
Work undertaken:
Superheater installed
   
19/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1921. Dep: 25/06/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 237 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
28/07/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1923. Dep: 20/10/1923.    
1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1926. Dep: 05/06/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5965
   
10/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1927. Dep: 18/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 898 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
17/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1930. Dep: 21/06/1930.    
13/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1932. Dep: 27/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 834 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1934. Dep: 03/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/11/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
19/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
29/10/1938 Withdrawn Condemned as 5965 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev