Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 6 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2867 Week
» 21649 Month
» 269942 Year
» 1154323 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1174 m/e 06/1910
LNER (1924) 6174   21/03/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 06/1910 to Mexborough (MEX)
Withdrawal Fri 05/06/1936 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 26 yrs , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 6/6/36

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough (New) m/e 06/1910
ARD Ardsley 16/04/1928
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 02/03/1931
ARD Ardsley 04/06/1931
   Withdrawn 05/06/1936

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1400)
11/12/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1271)
31/03/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 165)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
22/11/1930 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 495)
02/09/1933 Diagram 19A boiler fitted (number 592)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/06/1915 13/11/1915 141 days General
Superheater installed
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1920 11/12/1920 134 days General
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1922 20/01/1923 57 days General  
Gorton Works 17/01/1925 21/03/1925 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6174
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1928 31/03/1928 50 days General
Boiler number 165 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1930 22/11/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1933 02/09/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 592 (Diagram 19A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 1174
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Mexborough (MEX)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
26/06/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1915. Dep: 13/11/1915.
Work undertaken:
Superheater installed
   
31/07/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1920. Dep: 11/12/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
25/11/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1922. Dep: 20/01/1923.    
17/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1925. Dep: 21/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6174
   
11/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1928. Dep: 31/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 165 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
16/04/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
25/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
02/03/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
04/06/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
19/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 592 (Diagram 19A)
   
05/06/1936 Withdrawn Condemned as 6174 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev