|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/06/1915 | 13/11/1915 | 141 days | General | Superheater installed |
||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1920 | 11/12/1920 | 134 days | General | Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1922 | 20/01/1923 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1925 | 21/03/1925 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6174 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1928 | 31/03/1928 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 165 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1930 | 22/11/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1933 | 02/09/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 592 (Diagram 19A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1910 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1174 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Mexborough (MEX) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
26/06/1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1915. Dep: 13/11/1915. Work undertaken: Superheater installed |
||
31/07/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1920. Dep: 11/12/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
25/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1922. Dep: 20/01/1923. | ||
17/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1925. Dep: 21/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6174 |
||
11/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1928. Dep: 31/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 165 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
16/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
12/1928 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
25/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
02/03/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
04/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
19/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 592 (Diagram 19A) |
||
05/06/1936 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6174 from Ardsley (ARD) |