Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 8 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2869 Week
» 21651 Month
» 269944 Year
» 1154325 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1175 m/e 06/1910
LNER (1924) 6175   15/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3239   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/106/1910
Q4/229/01/1916
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 06/1910
Withdrawal Mon 19/07/1943 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 21/08/1910
ARD Ardsley 19/11/1936
   Withdrawn 19/07/1943

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1401)
29/01/1916 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1401)
13/01/1923 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 858)
12/03/1927 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1701)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
24/10/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1841)
16/02/1935 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1682)
24/03/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 898)
01/02/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3726)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/06/1915 29/01/1916 239 days General
Superheater installed
Boiler number 1401 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1922 13/01/1923 162 days General
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1924 15/03/1924 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6175
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1926 12/03/1927 155 days General
Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1929 08/06/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 03/10/1931 24/10/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1935 16/02/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1682 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1938 23/04/1938 22 days General  
Gorton Works 18/01/1941 01/02/1941 15 days General
Not repaired
Boiler number 3726 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 1175
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
21/08/1910 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
05/06/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1915. Dep: 29/01/1916.
Work undertaken:
Superheater installed
Boiler number 1401 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
18/02/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - (Heavy) - Arr: 18/02/1920. Dep: 12/10/1920.    
05/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1922. Dep: 13/01/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
19/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6175
   
09/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1926. Dep: 12/03/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
11/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929.    
03/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
02/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1935. Dep: 16/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1682 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/11/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
24/03/1938 Modification Diagram 17Sup number 898 boiler fitted    
02/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1938. Dep: 23/04/1938.    
18/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1941. Dep: 01/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Not repaired
Boiler number 3726 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
19/07/1943 Withdrawn Condemned as 6175 from Ardsley (ARD)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 3239 but not taken up    

prev prev