|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/06/1915 | 29/01/1916 | 239 days | General | Superheater installed Boiler number 1401 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
18/02/1920 | 12/10/1920 | 238 days | Heavy | ||||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1922 | 13/01/1923 | 162 days | General | Boiler number 858 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1924 | 15/03/1924 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6175 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1926 | 12/03/1927 | 155 days | General | Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1929 | 08/06/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1931 | 24/10/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1935 | 16/02/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1682 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1938 | 23/04/1938 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1941 | 01/02/1941 | 15 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 3726 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1910 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1175 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
21/08/1910 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
05/06/1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1915. Dep: 29/01/1916. Work undertaken: Superheater installed Boiler number 1401 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
05/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1922. Dep: 13/01/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 858 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
19/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6175 |
||
09/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1926. Dep: 12/03/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/1928 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
11/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929. | ||
03/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1841 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
02/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1935. Dep: 16/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1682 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
19/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
24/03/1938 | Modification | Diagram 17Sup number 898 boiler fitted | ||
02/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1938. Dep: 23/04/1938. | ||
18/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1941. Dep: 01/02/1941. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 3726 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
19/07/1943 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6175 from Ardsley (ARD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 3239 but not taken up |