Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 530 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2437 Week
» 21219 Month
» 269512 Year
» 1153893 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1176 m/e 07/1910
LNER (1924) 6176   31/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3240   03/11/1946
BR 63240 w/e 26/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/107/1910
Q4/202/12/1922
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 07/1910 to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Withdrawal Wed 13/06/1951 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 40 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 16/6/51

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction (New) m/e 07/1910
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 03/08/1943
NWE New England 12/12/1943
NWE New England (M&GNR) 27/08/1944
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 28/10/1945
GRA Grantham 13/10/1946
37A Ardsley 04/06/1950
   Withdrawn 13/06/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37A Ardsley m/e 30/06/1950
WDN   13/06/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1402)
08/08/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1378)
06/07/1918 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1267)
02/12/1922 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1610)
30/06/1928 Diagram 19A boiler fitted (number 903)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
05/04/1930 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 896)
14/05/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 847)
08/12/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 896)
27/03/1937 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 842)
29/07/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 145)
20/12/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 848)
16/05/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3730)
22/02/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 908)
26/02/1949 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3726)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1914 08/08/1914   General
Boiler number 1378 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 1918 06/07/1918   General
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1922 02/12/1922 176 days General
Boiler number 1610 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1924 31/05/1924 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6176
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1926 22/05/1926 106 days General  
Gorton Works 12/05/1928 30/06/1928 50 days General
Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1930 05/04/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1932 14/05/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1934 08/12/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1935 04/05/1935 36 days Light Repair
New R.H. cylinder
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1937 27/03/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1939 29/07/1939 15 days General
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 145 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1941 20/12/1941 37 days General
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1944 16/05/1944 11 days General
Boiler number 3730 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1947 22/02/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 908 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1949 26/02/1949 8 days Heavy
Tablet exchange apparatus fitted
Boiler number 3726 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63240
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 1176
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 08/08/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1378 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: 06/07/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
10/06/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1922. Dep: 02/12/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1610 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
05/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6176
   
06/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1926. Dep: 22/05/1926.    
12/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1928. Dep: 30/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A)
   
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
15/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1930. Dep: 05/04/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1932. Dep: 14/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 847 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
24/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1934. Dep: 08/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/03/1935. Dep: 04/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
New R.H. cylinder
   
13/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1937. Dep: 27/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 842 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
15/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
Boiler number 145 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
14/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1941. Dep: 20/12/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
06/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1944. Dep: 16/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3730 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
27/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE) (M&GNR)    
28/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
13/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3240    
25/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 22/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 908 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
19/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/02/1949. Dep: 26/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tablet exchange apparatus fitted
Boiler number 3726 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63240
   
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
13/06/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63240 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev