Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 1023 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3122 Week
» 14693 Month
» 262986 Year
» 1147367 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1178 m/e 10/1910
LNER (1924) 6178   16/02/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/110/1910
Q4/211/02/1922
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 10/1910
Withdrawal Tue 15/08/1939
Service Life 28 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 29/04/1911
KEA Keadby m/e 1922
ARD Ardsley 31/12/1929
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 04/10/1930
   Withdrawn 15/08/1939

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1409)
19/08/1916 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1634)
06/12/1919 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1272)
11/02/1922 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 844)
12/12/1925 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 650)
12/1928 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
28/12/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 370)
03/12/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 897)
14/03/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 832)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/02/1916 19/08/1916 183 days General
Boiler number 1634 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1919 06/12/1919 50 days General
Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1921 11/02/1922 71 days General
Boiler number 844 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1923 16/02/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6178
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1925 12/12/1925 64 days General
Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1928 18/08/1928 36 days General  
Gorton Works 07/12/1929 28/12/1929 22 days General
Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1932 03/12/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1936 14/03/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1936 10/10/1936 15 days Light Repair  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 1178
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
29/04/1911 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
19/02/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1916. Dep: 19/08/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1634 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/10/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1919. Dep: 06/12/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
03/12/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1921. Dep: 11/02/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 844 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
1922 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
08/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1923. Dep: 16/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6178
   
10/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1925. Dep: 12/12/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
14/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1928. Dep: 18/08/1928.    
12/1928 Modification Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge    
07/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1929. Dep: 28/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
31/12/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
04/10/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
26/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
26/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/09/1936. Dep: 10/10/1936.    
15/08/1939 Withdrawn Condemned as 6178    

prev prev