Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1179 m/e 11/1910
LNER (1924) 6179   03/01/1925
LNER (1946) 3242   Not applied
LNER (1946) 9936   26/05/1946
BR 69936   28/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/111/1910
Q4/224/02/1923
Q1/228/04/1945
Wheels 0-8-0T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 11/1910 to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Withdrawal Tue 15/09/1959 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 48 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 26/9/59

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LNG Langwith Junction (New) m/e 11/1910
ANN Annesley 10/03/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 15/04/1936
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 03/08/1943
NWE New England 12/12/1943
NWE New England (M&GNR) 27/08/1944
DON Doncaster 25/08/1946
FRO Frodingham 28/09/1946
   Withdrawn 15/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   15/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1910 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1410)
12/06/1915 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 838)
17/04/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 195)
24/02/1923 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1400)
03/12/1927 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 840)
08/02/1930 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
01/07/1933 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1677)
14/12/1935 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 893)
11/12/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1841)
03/08/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 849)
24/10/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 725)
28/04/1945 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3746)
28/08/1948 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 3750)
30/06/1951 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22983)
06/03/1954 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22982)
10/11/1956 Diagram 17A boiler fitted (number 22987)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 06/02/1915 12/06/1915 127 days General
Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1920 17/04/1920 78 days General
Boiler number 195 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1922 24/02/1923 176 days General
Boiler number 1400 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1924 03/01/1925 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6179
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1927 03/12/1927 99 days General
Boiler number 840 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1930 08/02/1930 29 days General
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1933 01/07/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1677 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1935 14/12/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1937 11/12/1937 15 days General  
Gorton Works 13/07/1940 03/08/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1940 19/10/1940 15 days Light Repair
After derailment
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1942 24/10/1942 19 days General
Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Doncaster Works 03/03/1945 1 day Rebuilding
Rebuilt to class Q1
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1948 28/08/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 3750 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69936
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1951 30/06/1951 33 days General
Boiler number 22983 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1954 06/03/1954 42 days General
New cylinders
Boiler number 22982 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1954 31/03/1954 23 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 12/09/1956 10/11/1956 60 days General
Boiler number 22987 (Diagram 17A)
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1956 17/11/1956 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 08/04/1958 26/04/1958 19 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1910 To Service To service as GCR Number 1179
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
06/02/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1915. Dep: 12/06/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
31/01/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1920. Dep: 17/04/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 195 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
02/09/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1922. Dep: 24/02/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1400 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
10/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
15/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1924. Dep: 03/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6179
   
27/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 03/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 840 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
11/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 08/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
17/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1933. Dep: 01/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1677 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
30/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 14/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
15/04/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
11/12/1936 Modification Diagram 17Sup number 1841 boiler fitted    
27/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 11/12/1937.    
13/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1940. Dep: 03/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
05/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/10/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
After derailment
   
06/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
27/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE) (M&GNR)    
03/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 03/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class Q1
   
28/04/1945 Modification Diagram 17A number 3746 boiler fitted    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 3242 but not taken up    
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9936    
25/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
28/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
24/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1948. Dep: 28/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3750 (Diagram 17A)
Renumbered to BR 69936
   
29/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1951. Dep: 30/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22983 (Diagram 17A)
   
24/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
Boiler number 22982 (Diagram 17A)
   
09/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1954. Dep: 31/03/1954.    
12/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1956. Dep: 10/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22987 (Diagram 17A)
   
13/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1956. Dep: 17/11/1956.    
08/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/04/1958. Dep: 26/04/1958.    
15/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69936 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev