Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1180 m/e 01/1911
LNER (1924) 6180   23/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3243   01/09/1946
BR (Tmp) E3243   13/03/1948
BR 63243 w/e 23/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/101/1911
Q4/212/08/1939
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 01/1911
Withdrawal Mon 15/10/1951 off Ardsley (37A)
Service Life 40 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 15/11/1919
DON Doncaster 18/03/1924
MAR March 15/07/1925
LNG Langwith Junction 02/03/1929
MEX Mexborough 07/05/1937
GRA Grantham 23/02/1947
37A Ardsley 11/06/1950
   Withdrawn 15/10/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GRA Grantham 23/02/1947
ALLOC 31A Cambridge m/e 30/06/1950
WDN   15/10/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1416)
03/03/1917 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1409)
29/10/1921 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1691)
23/02/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 407)
18/01/1930 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 431)
02/04/1932 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 442)
07/07/1934 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 522)
20/06/1936 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 438)
12/08/1939 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
12/08/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 918)
24/10/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3735)
10/03/1945 Diagram 19A boiler fitted (number 903)
13/03/1948 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3737)
23/04/1949 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3777)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/08/1916 03/03/1917 190 days General
Returned to UK 13/6/19
Boiler number 1409 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1919 23/08/1919 36 days General  
Gorton Works 30/07/1921 29/10/1921 92 days General
Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1923 23/02/1924 155 days General
Boiler number 407 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6180
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1927 03/12/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 21/12/1929 18/01/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 05/07/1930 26/07/1930 22 days Light Repair
New L.H. cylinder
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1932 02/04/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1934 07/07/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 522 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1936 20/06/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 438 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1939 12/08/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1942 24/10/1942 17 days General
Boiler number 3735 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1945 10/03/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1948 13/03/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3243
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1949 23/04/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 3777 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63243
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1911 To Service To service as GCR Number 1180
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
26/08/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1916. Dep: 03/03/1917.
Work undertaken:
Returned to UK 13/6/19
Boiler number 1409 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
19/07/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1919. Dep: 23/08/1919.    
15/11/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
30/07/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1921. Dep: 29/10/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1691 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
22/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1923. Dep: 23/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 407 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6180
   
18/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
15/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
22/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 03/12/1927.    
02/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
21/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1929. Dep: 18/01/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
05/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/07/1930. Dep: 26/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
New L.H. cylinder
   
19/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1932. Dep: 02/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
23/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1934. Dep: 07/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 522 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
06/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 438 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
07/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
05/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 918 (Diagram 17Sup)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
08/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3735 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
24/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A)
   
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3243    
23/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
21/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1948. Dep: 13/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3737 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3243
   
09/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3777 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to BR 63243
   
11/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
15/10/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 63243 from Ardsley (37A)    

prev prev