Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 942 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5073 Week
» 15243 Month
» 293039 Year
» 1177420 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1181 m/e 01/1911
LNER (1924) 6181   31/05/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class Q4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q4/101/1911
Q4/216/02/1929
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
To Service During 01/1911 to Immingham (IMM)
Withdrawal Thu 16/03/1939 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 28 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham (New) m/e 01/1911
DON Doncaster 06/04/1927
MEX Mexborough 17/02/1934
LNG Langwith Junction 04/12/1936
ARD Ardsley 09/03/1937
   Withdrawn 16/03/1939

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1911 Diagram 12A boiler fitted (number LT20)
10/06/1916 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1412)
19/11/1921 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1409)
31/05/1924 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 525)
16/02/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 914)
16/02/1929 Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
28/02/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 333)
18/03/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1632)
11/04/1936 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 840)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 04/12/1915 10/06/1916 190 days General
Boiler number 1412 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1921 19/11/1921 50 days General
Boiler number 1409 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1923 31/05/1924 169 days General
Boiler number 525 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6181
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1926 09/10/1926 78 days General  
Gorton Works 22/12/1928 16/02/1929 57 days General
Boiler number 914 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1931 28/02/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1933 18/03/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1632 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1936 11/04/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 840 (Diagram 17Sat)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1911 To Service To service as GCR Number 1181
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Immingham (IMM)
Diagram 12A boiler fitted
   
04/12/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1915. Dep: 10/06/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1412 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
01/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1921. Dep: 19/11/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1409 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
15/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1923. Dep: 31/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 525 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6181
   
24/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1926. Dep: 09/10/1926.    
06/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
22/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1928. Dep: 16/02/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 914 (Diagram 17Sat)
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge
   
14/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1931. Dep: 28/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 18/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1632 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
17/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
28/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1936. Dep: 11/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 840 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
04/12/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
09/03/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
16/03/1939 Withdrawn Condemned as 6181 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev