|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1907 | 09/1907 | General | Boiler number G615 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1912 | 10/1912 | General | Boiler number G159 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1918 | 05/1918 | General | Boiler number D726 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1923 | 20/09/1923 | 80 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1927 | 14/02/1928 | 76 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1930 | 20/08/1930 | 70 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1933 | 03/05/1933 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1485 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1936 | 20/10/1936 | 40 days | General | Boiler number D1757 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1939 | 04/01/1940 | 196 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1940 | 11/09/1940 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1942 | 19/08/1942 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2278 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1943 | 03/07/1943 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1944 | 10/08/1944 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 2797 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 20/03/1946 | 04/04/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3252 |
||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1946 | 09/01/1947 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/01/1948 | 12/01/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1901 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2118 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 12 01 Allocated to Shildon (SHI) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
1905 | Modification | Diagram 56 number G138 boiler fitted | ||
03/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1923. Dep: 20/09/1923. | ||
01/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1927. Dep: 14/02/1928. | ||
12/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1930. Dep: 20/08/1930. | ||
06/01/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (KBY) | ||
28/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1933. Dep: 03/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1485 (Diagram 56) |
||
11/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1936. Dep: 20/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1757 (Diagram 56) |
||
23/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/06/1939. Dep: 04/01/1940. | ||
06/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1940. Dep: 11/09/1940. | ||
02/09/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
14/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (KBY) | ||
30/03/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
10/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1942. Dep: 19/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2278 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
23/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943. | ||
23/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1944. Dep: 10/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2797 (Diagram 56B) |
||
20/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/03/1946. Dep: 04/04/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3252 |
||
21/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1946. Dep: 09/01/1947. | ||
27/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
12/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/01/1948. Dep: 12/01/1948. | ||
07/02/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3252 from Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63252 but not taken up |