|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1919 | 04/1919 | General | Boiler number D714 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1923 | 25/05/1923 | 86 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1925 | 30/11/1925 | 75 days | General | Boiler number D737 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1928 | 18/12/1928 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1932 | 05/08/1932 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 2227 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1935 | 08/03/1935 | 31 days | General | Boiler number D1769 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1938 | 02/07/1938 | 41 days | General | Boiler number D1004 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1940 | 11/10/1940 | 31 days | General | Tender only Boiler number 2159 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1942 | 31/12/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2271 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1945 | 11/06/1945 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 2904 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 06/08/1946 | 19/08/1946 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/06/1947 | 23/08/1947 | 59 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1948 | 25/05/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1901 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2120 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 14 01 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
01/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1923. Dep: 25/05/1923. | ||
17/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1925. Dep: 30/11/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D737 (Diagram 56) |
||
02/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1928. Dep: 18/12/1928. | ||
13/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1932. Dep: 05/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2227 (Diagram 56) |
||
06/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1935. Dep: 08/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1769 (Diagram 56) |
||
06/02/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
23/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1004 (Diagram 56) |
||
07/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
11/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1940. Dep: 11/10/1940. Work undertaken: Tender only Boiler number 2159 (Diagram 56) |
||
26/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1942. Dep: 31/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2271 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
17/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1945. Dep: 11/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2904 (Diagram 56B) |
||
06/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/08/1946. Dep: 19/08/1946. | ||
22/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3254 | ||
26/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/06/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947. | ||
25/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/05/1948. Dep: 25/05/1948. | ||
06/1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
11/06/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3254 from Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63254 but not taken up |