|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1917 | 01/1917 | General | Boiler number D593 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1924 | 27/05/1924 | 71 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 09/07/1927 | 19/09/1927 | 73 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/10/1930 | 19/11/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1934 | 25/10/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2150 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1937 | 17/11/1937 | 36 days | General | Boiler number D1457 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1941 | 20/03/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2270 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1942 | 13/06/1942 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1942 | 03/09/1942 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1942 | 21/12/1942 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1943 | 16/10/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2279 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/01/1945 | 10/02/1945 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1946 | 15/02/1947 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2889 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1947 | 14/03/1947 | 11 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1901 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2121 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 15 01 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
18/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1924. Dep: 27/05/1924. | ||
09/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shildon (SHI) | ||
27/01/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (NBH) | ||
09/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1927. Dep: 19/09/1927. | ||
15/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1930. Dep: 19/11/1930. | ||
27/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1934. Dep: 25/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2150 (Diagram 56) |
||
13/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1937. Dep: 17/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1457 (Diagram 56) |
||
17/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1941. Dep: 20/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2270 (Diagram 56) |
||
26/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/05/1942. Dep: 13/06/1942. | ||
12/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/08/1942. Dep: 03/09/1942. | ||
20/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1942. Dep: 21/12/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
17/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1943. Dep: 16/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2279 (Diagram 56) |
||
29/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/01/1945. Dep: 10/02/1945. | ||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3255 | ||
28/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1946. Dep: 15/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2889 (Diagram 56B) |
||
04/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1947. Dep: 14/03/1947. | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
29/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63255 but not taken up | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
03/11/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3255 from Selby (SEL) | ||
12/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |