|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1912 | 12/1912 | General | Boiler number D2100 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1923 | 31/07/1923 | 65 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1925 | 30/01/1926 | 102 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1929 | 17/05/1929 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2225 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1932 | 31/10/1932 | 34 days | General | In store at Paint Shop |
||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1936 | 06/08/1936 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2798 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1937 | 15/07/1937 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1938 | 28/01/1939 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1941 | 05/11/1941 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1944 | 13/03/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2798 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1945 | 25/04/1945 | 21 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/12/1945 | 12/01/1946 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1947 | 07/06/1947 | 78 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1947 | 04/07/1947 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1901 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2122 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 16 01 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
28/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1923. Dep: 31/07/1923. | ||
21/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1925. Dep: 30/01/1926. | ||
02/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1929. Dep: 17/05/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2225 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1932. Dep: 31/10/1932. Work undertaken: In store at Paint Shop |
||
15/12/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
19/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1936. Dep: 06/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2798 (Diagram 56B) |
||
05/12/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
08/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
29/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1937. Dep: 15/07/1937. | ||
07/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
16/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1938. Dep: 28/01/1939. | ||
06/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1941. Dep: 05/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 56B) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
21/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1944. Dep: 13/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2798 (Diagram 56B) |
||
05/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1945. Dep: 25/04/1945. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
24/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/12/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946. | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3256 | ||
22/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 07/06/1947. | ||
27/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/06/1947. Dep: 04/07/1947. | ||
27/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
03/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63256 but not taken up | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
22/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
28/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
12/06/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3256 from Middlesbrough (51D) |