|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1914 | 05/1914 | General | Boiler number G98 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1916 | 08/1916 | General | Boiler number D579 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 18/07/1923 | 29/09/1923 | 74 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1926 | 23/11/1926 | 106 days | General | Boiler number D1006 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1929 | 27/08/1929 | 51 days | General | Boiler number D1046 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1932 | 22/12/1932 | 28 days | General | Boiler number D1014 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1935 | 30/07/1935 | 54 days | General | Boiler number D2270 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1938 | 20/10/1938 | 51 days | General | Boiler number D1074 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1941 | 03/05/1941 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2167 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1943 | 17/11/1943 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2168 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1944 | 19/05/1944 | 47 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/04/1945 | 11/05/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1946 | 01/04/1946 | 24 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3257 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 2227 (Diagram 56) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1901 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2123 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 17 01 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
18/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1923. Dep: 29/09/1923. | ||
10/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1926. Dep: 23/11/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1006 (Diagram 56) |
||
08/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1929. Dep: 27/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1046 (Diagram 56) |
||
25/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1932. Dep: 22/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1014 (Diagram 56) |
||
07/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1935. Dep: 30/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2270 (Diagram 56) |
||
31/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1938. Dep: 20/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1074 (Diagram 56) |
||
31/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2167 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
25/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1943. Dep: 17/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2168 (Diagram 56) |
||
03/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1944. Dep: 19/05/1944. | ||
20/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/04/1945. Dep: 11/05/1945. | ||
09/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 01/04/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3257 |
||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2227 (Diagram 56) |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63257 but not taken up | ||
11/1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
27/11/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3257 from Borough Gardens (54C) |