|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1917 | 04/1917 | General | |||||
1919 | 11/1919 | General | Boiler number D1006 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1922 | 11/1922 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1924 | 30/04/1925 | 139 days | General | Boiler number D1037 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1928 | 23/05/1928 | 66 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1931 | 16/06/1931 | 33 days | General | Boiler number D854 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1934 | 22/01/1935 | 41 days | General | Boiler number D1454 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1937 | 27/08/1937 | 81 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1939 | 06/03/1939 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2080 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1942 | 28/04/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2225 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1944 | 13/12/1944 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2073 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/05/1946 | 23/05/1946 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1946 | 31/12/1946 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1947 | 06/02/1948 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 2806 (Diagram 56B) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3260 |
||
Gateshead Works | 04/05/1949 | 20/05/1949 | 17 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1902 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 130 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 20 01 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/04/1917 | Modification | Diagram 56 number G252 boiler fitted | ||
13/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1924. Dep: 30/04/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1037 (Diagram 56) |
||
19/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1928. Dep: 23/05/1928. | ||
15/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1931. Dep: 16/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D854 (Diagram 56) |
||
18/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
13/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1934. Dep: 22/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1454 (Diagram 56) |
||
08/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/06/1937. Dep: 27/08/1937. | ||
02/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1939. Dep: 06/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2080 (Diagram 56) |
||
31/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1942. Dep: 28/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2225 (Diagram 56) |
||
17/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1944. Dep: 13/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2073 (Diagram 56) |
||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
01/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3260 | ||
10/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/05/1946. Dep: 23/05/1946. | ||
06/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1946. Dep: 31/12/1946. | ||
20/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
08/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1947. Dep: 06/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2806 (Diagram 56B) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3260 |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63260 but not taken up | ||
04/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/05/1949. Dep: 20/05/1949. | ||
1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
21/06/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3260 from Middlesbrough (51D) |