Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 527 m/e 03/1902
LNER (1946) 3261   19/05/1946
BR (Tmp) E3261   24/02/1948
BR 63261   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class Q5
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q5/103/1902
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Gateshead Works
Order Number A139
Works Number 1 02
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1902 to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Withdrawal Tue 31/10/1950 off Borough Gardens (54C)
Scrapping During y/e 1950 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 48 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys
Information Slide valves

Notes
Notes Cut up at BRW07

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NPT Newport (Teeside) (New) m/e 03/1902
TDK Tyne Dock 28/03/1943
BOR Borough Gardens 13/04/1947
   Withdrawn 31/10/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BOR Borough Gardens 13/04/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1902 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number G72)
02/1909 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number G255)
11/1911 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number G331)
12/1919 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number D1013)
25/09/1933 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number 2269)
17/01/1939 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number 2068)
14/03/1944 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number 2232)
28/12/1946 Diagram 56 boiler fitted (number 2281)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 16/05/1923 30/07/1923 76 days General  
Darlington Works 13/01/1926 28/04/1926 106 days General  
Darlington Works 19/08/1929 08/10/1929 51 days General  
Darlington Works 15/08/1933 25/09/1933 42 days General
Boiler number 2269 (Diagram 56)
 
Darlington Works 15/04/1936 10/06/1936 57 days General  
Darlington Works 02/12/1938 17/01/1939 47 days General
Boiler number 2068 (Diagram 56)
 
Darlington Works 26/05/1941 30/06/1941 36 days General  
Darlington Works 21/02/1944 14/03/1944 23 days General
Boiler number 2232 (Diagram 56)
 
Gateshead Works 10/08/1945 22/08/1945 13 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 26/11/1946 28/12/1946 33 days General
Boiler number 2281 (Diagram 56)
 
Gateshead Works 15/01/1948 24/02/1948 41 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3261
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1902 To Service To service as NER Number 527
Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 1 02
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Diagram 56 boiler fitted
   
1909 Works Visit Works Visit - (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: ?/02/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number G255 (Diagram 56)
   
1911 Works Visit Works Visit - (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/11/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number G331 (Diagram 56)
   
1919 Works Visit Works Visit - (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/12/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1013 (Diagram 56)
   
16/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1923. Dep: 30/07/1923.    
13/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1926. Dep: 28/04/1926.    
19/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1929. Dep: 08/10/1929.    
15/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1933. Dep: 25/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2269 (Diagram 56)
   
15/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1936. Dep: 10/06/1936.    
02/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1938. Dep: 17/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2068 (Diagram 56)
   
26/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1941. Dep: 30/06/1941.    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
21/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1944. Dep: 14/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2232 (Diagram 56)
   
10/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1945. Dep: 22/08/1945.    
19/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3261    
26/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1946. Dep: 28/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2281 (Diagram 56)
   
13/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)    
15/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/01/1948. Dep: 24/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3261
   
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 63261 but not taken up    
1950 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
31/10/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 3261 from Borough Gardens (54C)    

prev prev